+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Executive
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Firearms (JU)
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 410 ILCS 130/5 -
- 430 ILCS 65/1.1 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-1.1
- 430 ILCS 65/8 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-8
- 430 ILCS 65/10 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor