+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
- Arrived in House
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
- Second Reading
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
- Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Criminal Law
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 150/2 - from Ch. 38, par. 222