+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LA)
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/5-167.1 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 5-167.1
- 30 ILCS 805/8.42 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor