+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (53)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1519
- Effective Date February 4, 2011
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 045-009-001
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Insurance; 008-000-001
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - January 6, 2011
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Insurance
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Reitz
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2011
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2010
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 007-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2010
- Second Reading
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Pensions and Investments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010
- Do Pass as Amended Pensions and Investments; 008-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Pensions and Investments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions and Investments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Requires every retirement system, pension fund, or other system or fund established under the Code, other than a State-funded retirement system or the State or the Illinois State Board of Investment, to indemnify and protect the trustees against all damage claims and suits, and makes indemnification discretionary for trustees of the State-funded retirement systems, for members of the Illinois State Board of Investment, and for staff and consultants of every retirement system, pension fund, or other system or fund established under the Code. Effective immediately.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Requires every retirement system, pension fund, or other system or fund established under the Code, other than a State-funded retirement system or the State or the Illinois State Board of Investment, to indemnify and protect the trustees against all damage claims and suits, and makes indemnification discretionary for trustees of the State-funded retirement systems, for members of the Illinois State Board of Investment, and for staff and consultants of every retirement system, pension fund, or other system or fund established under the Code. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 40 ILCS 5/1-107 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 1-107
- 40 ILCS 5/1-109.1 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 1-109.1
- 40 ILCS 5/1-125 -