+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On November 29, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On October 20, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-006-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
On October 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On October 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
On October 14, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On May 15, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
- Arrived in House
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-004-000
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
- Second Reading
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021
- Do Pass Health; 010-006-000
- Reported Back To Health; 004-000-000
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Managed Care Organizations (MCO's)
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the amount and nature of medical assistance.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 305 ILCS 5/5F-35 -
- 305 ILCS 5/5-4 - from Ch. 23, par. 5-4
+ − Votes (4)
October 20, 2021: SB0251 - Executive
April 23, 2021: SB0251 - Third Reading
March 16, 2021: SB0251 - Sub. on Managed Care Organizations
March 16, 2021: SB0251 - Health
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor