+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0892
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2009
On June 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 28, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 19, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 15, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2008
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2008
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2008
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 007-000-000
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary Criminal Law
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 725 ILCS 5/115-7.3 -
- 725 ILCS 5/115-10 - from Ch. 38, par. 115-10
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2008: SB2509 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 28, 2008
April 2, 2008: SB2509 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 02, 2008
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor