+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Rules; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Rules; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Held in Insurance
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Insurance
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Held in Insurance
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance
On March 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2008
- Do Pass Insurance; 009-000-001
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 215 ILCS 5/143.29 - from Ch. 73, par. 755.29
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor