+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On January 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor