+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
- Do Pass Executive; 011-005-000
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 10 ILCS 5/2A-1.2 - from Ch. 46, par. 2A-1.2
- 10 ILCS 5/2A-48 - from Ch. 46, par. 2A-48
- 105 ILCS 5/34-3 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-3
- 105 ILCS 5/34-4 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-4
- 105 ILCS 5/34-4.1 new -
- 105 ILCS 5/34-4.2 new -
- 105 ILCS 5/34-13.1 -
- 105 ILCS 5/34-21.9 new -
+ − Vote
April 14, 2021: SB2497 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor