+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On August 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 27, 2021
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0656
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-001-000
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2021
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ram Villivalam
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Margaret Croke
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
In provisions amending the Regulatory Sunset Act, provides for the repeal of the Collateral Recovery Act on January 1, 2027 (rather than on January 1, 2032).
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following change. Removes the changes made to the Collateral Recovery Act. Effective immediately.