+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 19, 2010
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- To Executive Subcommittee on Education
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On October 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James T. Meeks
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor