+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On August 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0563
- Effective Date August 20, 2021
- Governor Approved
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Villivalam
- Recalled to Second Reading
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-000-000
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
- Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that the changes made by Public Act 97-966, to provisions governing the circumstances in which it is not necessary to fix by contract a time for the completion or a time for payment in order to obtain a lien under the Act, are operative from January 1, 2013 through December 31, 2024 (rather than December 31, 2026).
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 770 ILCS 60/6 - from Ch. 82, par. 6
+ − Votes (5)
May 27, 2021: SB2494 - Third Reading
May 12, 2021: SB2494 - Judiciary - Civil
April 29, 2021: SB2494 - Third Reading
April 27, 2021: SFA0001 - Judiciary
April 13, 2021: SB2494 - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor