+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Executive- Government Operations
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 30 ILCS 535/30 - from Ch. 127, par. 4151-30
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor