+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0562
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Governor Approved
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2021
- Second Reading
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2021
- Do Pass as Amended Labor; 013-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that an individual may file a complaint with the Director of Labor or commence an action alleging a violation within 3, rather than 7, years after the date of the disclosure of the disciplinary action.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 40/7 - from Ch. 48, par. 2007
+ − Votes (5)
May 27, 2021: SB2486 - Third Reading
May 12, 2021: SB2486 - Labor & Commerce
April 23, 2021: SB2486 - Third Reading
April 21, 2021: SB2486 - Labor
April 21, 2021: SCA0001 - Labor
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor