+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 35 ILCS 105/9 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.9
- 35 ILCS 110/9 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.39
- 35 ILCS 115/9 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.109
- 35 ILCS 120/3 - from Ch. 120, par. 442
- 35 ILCS 130/2 - from Ch. 120, par. 453.2
- 35 ILCS 135/3 - from Ch. 120, par. 453.33
- 35 ILCS 145/6 - from Ch. 120, par. 481b.36
- 35 ILCS 505/2b - from Ch. 120, par. 418b
- 35 ILCS 505/6 - from Ch. 120, par. 422
- 35 ILCS 505/6a - from Ch. 120, par. 422a
- 35 ILCS 630/6 - from Ch. 120, par. 2006
- 235 ILCS 5/8-2 - from Ch. 43, par. 159