+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce; 008-000-000
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021
- Second Reading
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Commerce
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Commerce
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
- Do Pass Commerce; 011-000-000
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Commerce
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (2)
April 22, 2021: SFA0002 - Commerce
April 15, 2021: SB2481 - Commerce
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor