+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Executive
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Executive- Procurement
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor