+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 7, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-001-000
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2008
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2008
- Do Pass Pensions and Investments; 008-001-000
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
April 17, 2008: SB2479 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 17, 2008
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor