+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
- Do Pass Agriculture; 013-000-000
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Agriculture
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 15, 2021: SB2474 - Agriculture
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor