+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Pensions
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Pensions
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 40 ILCS 5/8-165 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 8-165
- 40 ILCS 5/8-180.3 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/8-180.4 new -
- 30 ILCS 805/8.45 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor