+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2021
- Do Pass as Amended State Government; 009-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that the Department of Transportation shall not, for the purpose of establishing overhead rates in any contract entered into between the Department and a firm (rather than an engineering firm), consider any loans forgiven under the federal Paycheck Protection Program as a credit to the government in a way that would result in a reduced payment amount owed to the firm under the contract.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
April 21, 2021: SB2469 - State Government
April 21, 2021: SCA0001 - State Government
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor