+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 820 ILCS 405/900 - from Ch. 48, par. 490
- 820 ILCS 405/1900 - from Ch. 48, par. 640
- 820 ILCS 405/2206.2 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor