+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
On November 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 16, 2016
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Amendatory Veto
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-054-000
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Sonya M. Harper
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Carol Ammons
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-002-000
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-019-001
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 8, 2016
- Second Reading
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 3, 2016
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 730 ILCS 5/3-2-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-2-2
- 730 ILCS 5/3-12-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-12-2
- 730 ILCS 5/3-12-5 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-12-5
- 730 ILCS 5/3-7-6 rep. -
- 735 ILCS 5/4-101 - from Ch. 110, par. 4-101
+ − Votes (4)
May 25, 2016: SB2465 - Third Reading
May 3, 2016: SB2465 - Judiciary - Criminal
April 5, 2016: SB2465 - Third Reading
March 2, 2016: SB2465 - Criminal Law
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor