+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0561
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-044-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
- Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2021
- Second Reading
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2021
- Do Pass as Amended State Government; 009-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
- Postponed - State Government
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
- Assigned to State Government
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Removes provisions making changes to the Secretary of State Act concerning the use of a municipal identification card as an acceptable secondary form of identification. Provides that for applications for services as may be provided by any department, an Illinois municipal identification card shall be considered an acceptable secondary form of identification if such identification is required by an applicable department. Provides that any State-owned building that requires the display of a State-issued identification card for the purpose of gaining access to the premises shall accept the use of any Illinois municipal identification card as an acceptable form of identification for the purpose of entering the premises. Provides that an Illinois municipal identification card may not be sufficient to access certain secure areas within the premises and may require additional authorization or identification at the discretion of the premises' security, the Department of Central Management Services, or the user agency. Modifies the definition of "municipal identification card". Makes conforming changes.