+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0572
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Villivalam
- Recalled to Second Reading
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
- Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Provides an exception to the use of electronic signatures for transactions involving technical submissions. Defines "technical submissions". Makes conforming changes.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 26, 2021: SB2459 - Third Reading
May 11, 2021: SB2459 - Transportation: Regulation, Roads
April 22, 2021: SB2459 - Third Reading
April 21, 2021: SFA0001 - State Government
April 14, 2021: SB2459 - State Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor