+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Revenue
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 35 ILCS 105/3-5 -
- 35 ILCS 105/3-10 -
- 35 ILCS 110/3-5 -
- 35 ILCS 110/3-10 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.33-10
- 35 ILCS 115/3-5 -
- 35 ILCS 115/3-10 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.103-10
- 35 ILCS 120/2-5 -
- 35 ILCS 120/2-10 -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor