+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0560
- Effective Date August 20, 2021
- Governor Approved
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
- Arrived in House
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
- Second Reading
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
- Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 27, 2021: SB2455 - Third Reading
May 12, 2021: SB2455 - Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
April 23, 2021: SB2455
April 13, 2021: SB2455 - Transportation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor