+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0559
- Effective Date August 20, 2021
- Governor Approved
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
- Arrived in House
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
- Second Reading
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
- Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 5 ILCS 140/7.5 -
- 20 ILCS 2705/2705-300 - was 20 ILCS 2705/49.18
- 20 ILCS 2705/2705-616 new -
- 70 ILCS 3605/9b - from Ch. 111 2/3, par. 309b
- 70 ILCS 3605/9c new -
- 70 ILCS 3615/2.11 - from Ch. 111 2/3, par. 702.11
- 45 ILCS 111/Act rep. -