+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor