+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0873
- Effective Date August 14, 2018
- Governor Approved
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-007-000
On May 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 050-001-000
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Haine
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
- Do Pass Revenue; 005-000-000
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (5)
May 23, 2018: SB2445 - Third Reading
May 17, 2018: SB2445 - Revenue & Finance
April 19, 2018: SB2445 - Third Reading
April 11, 2018: SFA0001 - Revenue
February 21, 2018: SB2445 - Revenue
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor