+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (71)
On June 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0729
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 1, 2012
On June 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 030-029-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 030-029-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Appropriations I; 007-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Appropriations I; 007-004-000
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-055-000
On May 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2012
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan Kotowski
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan Kotowski
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Appropriations I
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Appropriations I
On May 25, 2012 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 018-000-000
On May 24, 2012 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
On May 21, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On July 23, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 29, 2011 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 015-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 28, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
On May 16, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Kotowski
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 031-026-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule
On May 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Held in Appropriations II
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations II
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Appropriations II
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Held in Appropriations II
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2011
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2011
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Re-referred to Assignments
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations II
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
+ − Adopted Amendments (6)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Board of Higher Education for its FY12 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2011.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Board of Higher Education for its FY12 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2011.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes various appropriations related to education. Effective July 1, 2011.