+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On December 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-007-000
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
- Arrived in House
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
- Do Pass Higher Education; 013-000-000
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Higher Education
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (3)
May 8, 2019: SB0244 - Higher Education
March 21, 2019: SB0244 - Third Reading
March 12, 2019: SB0244 - Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor