+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
On April 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Appropriations II; 010-000-000
On April 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations II
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2012
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On July 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Re-referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2011
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2011
- Second Reading
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations I
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor