+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On May 15, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 22, 2021
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Makes formatting changes to the introduced bill to clarify that the provisions concerning investment partnerships apply for tax years ending on or after January 1, 2021.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 5/1501 - from Ch. 120, par. 15-1501