+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 27, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 23, 2012 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
On May 22, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
On April 25, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On July 23, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 16, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-024-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2011
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2011
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Re-referred to Assignments
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations I
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes appropriations and reappropriations to various agencies. Effective July 1, 2011.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes appropriations and reappropriations to various agencies. Effective July 1, 2011.