+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0802
- Effective Date January 1, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 19, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-000-000
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 012-000-000
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2008
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2008
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2008
- Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Held in Local Government
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
+ − Statute Amended
- 815 ILCS 380/2 - from Ch. 121 1/2, par. 1202
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2008: SB2422 - Third Reading - Monday, May 19, 2008
April 8, 2008: SB2422 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 08, 2008
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor