+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (66)
On June 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0076
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 1, 2011
On June 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - June 22, 2011
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
On June 22, 2011 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
On June 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
On June 22, 2011 in the House:
- 3/5 Vote Required
On June 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 052-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments;
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments;
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
On June 21, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On May 29, 2011 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-000-004
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On May 28, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On May 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Steans
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 030-027-000
On May 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Held in Appropriations I
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Held in Appropriations I
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011
- Second Reading
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 8, 2011
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Re-referred to Assignments
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations I
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Rights for its FY12 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2011.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Rights for its FY12 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2011.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes appropriations to the Department of Human Rights, the Human Rights Commission, the Deaf and Hard of Hearing Commission, and the Guardianship and Advocacy Commission. Effective July 1, 2011.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Changes appropriations to the Department of Human Rights and the Human Rights Commission.
+ − Votes (4)
June 22, 2011: HCA0001 - Concurrence - Wednesday, June 22, 2011
June 22, 2011: SB2414 - Third Reading - Wednesday, June 22, 2011
June 22, 2011: HFA0002 - Concurrence - Wednesday, June 22, 2011
May 4, 2011: SB2414 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 04, 2011
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor