+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0700
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2017
On June 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 020-000-000
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2016
- Second Reading
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 3, 2016
- Do Pass Human Services; 005-000-000
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 26, 2016: SB2407 - Third Reading
May 12, 2016: SB2407 - Appropriations-Human Services
April 19, 2016: SB2407 - Third Reading
March 2, 2016: SB2407 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor