+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
- Session Sine Die
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2010
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Revenue & Finance Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Bill Brady
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Dale A. Righter
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-005-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 8, 2010
- Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 008-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Haine
- Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2009
- Second Reading
- Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 010-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Assigned to Insurance
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Medical Sharing Trust Act. Sets forth the definition of "Medical Sharing Trust". Provides that an organization complying with the Act as a Medical Sharing Trust is not subject to the provisions of the Illinois Insurance Code, except that a Medical Sharing Trust offering any services other than a Medical Sharing Trust that are regulated under any provision of the Illinois Insurance Code shall be required to comply with the Illinois Insurance Code with respect to the provision of those services. Sets forth registration requirements for a Medical Sharing Trust. Provides that a Medical Sharing Trust may facilitate payments between participants who have present medical needs and participants with the ability to pay for the benefits of those participants in need. Sets forth provisions concerning the operation of a Medical Sharing Trust. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Makes technical changes in a Section concerning the short title.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Medical Sharing Trust Act. Sets forth the definition of "Medical Sharing Trust". Provides that an organization complying with the Act as a Medical Sharing Trust is not subject to the provisions of the Illinois Insurance Code, except that a Medical Sharing Trust offering any services other than a Medical Sharing Trust that are regulated under any provision of the Illinois Insurance Code shall be required to comply with the Illinois Insurance Code with respect to the provision of those services. Sets forth registration requirements for a Medical Sharing Trust. Provides that a Medical Sharing Trust may facilitate payments between participants who have present medical needs and participants with the ability to pay for the benefits of those participants in need. Sets forth provisions concerning the operation of a Medical Sharing Trust. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 215 ILCS 5/4 - from Ch. 73, par. 616