+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0848
- Effective Date January 1, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 19, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-003-000
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Drivers Education & Safety Committee; 008-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2008
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Drivers Education & Safety Committee
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cullerton
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary Criminal Law; 010-000-000
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary Criminal Law
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2008
- Second Reading
On March 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 11, 2008
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 008-000-000
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Increases the monthly fee for a driving permit conditioned on use of an ignition interlock, from $20 to $30.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 625 ILCS 5/6-205 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-205
- 625 ILCS 5/6-206 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-206
- 625 ILCS 5/11-501.01 -
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2008: SB2396 - Third Reading - Monday, May 19, 2008
April 16, 2008: SB2396 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 16, 2008
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor