+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020
On April 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On March 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020
- Second Reading
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Statute Amended
- 5 ILCS 140/5 - from Ch. 116, par. 205
+ − Vote
February 19, 2020: SB2392 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor