+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0655
- Sent to the Governor
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Health
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Health; 009-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- Senate Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 30, 2021
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura Fine
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
- Do Pass Health; 014-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
- Reported Back To Health; 005-000-000
- To Subcommittee on Medicaid
- Assigned to Health
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes to the Pediatric Palliative Care Act. Makes changes to the definition of "serious illness". Restores language requiring the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to apply for a waiver to implement the pediatric palliative care program. Defines a qualifying child to be a person under the age of 21 who is enrolled in the medical assistance program and is diagnosed by the child's primary physician or specialist as suffering from a serious illness (rather than a person under 19 years of age who is enrolled in the medical assistance program and suffers from a serious illness). Provides that those serious illnesses that render a child eligible for pediatric palliative care services include any other serious illness that the Department, in consultation with interested stakeholders, determines to be appropriate. Restores language making certain reimbursable services offered under the pediatric palliative care program subject to federal approval for matching funds. Changes "case manager" to "program manager". Changes "qualifying participants" to "qualifying children".