+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0805
- Effective Date July 24, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 011-000-000
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David E. Miller
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 24, 2004
- Second Reading
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2004
- Do Pass as Amended Health & Human Services; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Carol Ronen
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Health & Human Services
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Carol Ronen
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Clarifies that the comprehensive list of unsafe children's products is provided and maintained by the Department of Public Health.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2004: SB2378 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 04, 2004
March 4, 2004: SB2378 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 04, 2004
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor