+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (55)
On August 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0587
- Effective Date August 27, 2013
- Governor Approved
On June 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 052-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 052-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-001-000
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - May 29, 2013
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-040-001
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 043-006-000
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2013
- Do Pass Executive; 011-001-000
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides for the licensure of social clubs for the placement of video gaming terminals (and makes corresponding changes in the Criminal Code of 2012). Defines "licensed social club". Makes changes concerning background investigations of applicants for licensure. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 002
Removes language providing that changes to the definition of "licensed establishment" shall not be construed as a new enactment.
House Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the engrossed bill, but removes language providing that changes to the definition of "licensed establishment" shall not be construed as a new enactment. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- 230 ILCS 40/5 -
- 230 ILCS 40/45 -
- 230 ILCS 40/20 -
- 230 ILCS 40/25 -
- 230 ILCS 40/30 -
- 230 ILCS 40/35 -
- 230 ILCS 40/55 -
- 230 ILCS 40/58 -
- 230 ILCS 40/60 -
- 720 ILCS 5/28-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 28-1
- 720 ILCS 5/28-1.1 - from Ch. 38, par. 28-1.1
+ − Votes (5)
May 30, 2013: HFA0001 - Concurrence - Thursday, May 30, 2013
May 30, 2013: HFA0002 - Concurrence - Thursday, May 30, 2013
May 30, 2013: HFA0003 - Concurrence - Thursday, May 30, 2013
May 28, 2013: SB2371 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 28, 2013
April 11, 2013: SB2371 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 11, 2013
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor