+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0882
- Effective Date January 1, 2017
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee; 013-000-000
- Assigned to Juvenile Justice & System-Involved Youth Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Barbara Wheeler
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Van Pelt
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Van Pelt
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Laura M. Murphy
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2016
- Second Reading
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 013-001-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
- Reported Back To Executive; 004-001-000
- To Subcommittee on Police Professionalism
- Re-referred to Executive
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
Senate Amendment 004
Makes technical corrections, replacing "involuntarily made" with "inadmissible".
Senate Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that in a proceeding under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987, a minor who was under 15 (rather than 13) years of age at the time of the commission of an act that if committed by an adult would be a violation of various offenses of the Criminal Code of 1961 or the Criminal Code of 2012 must be represented by counsel throughout the entire custodial interrogation of the minor. Provides that an oral, written, or sign language statement of a minor, who at the time of the commission of the offense was under 18 years of age, is presumed to be involuntarily made when the statement is obtained from the minor while the minor is subject to custodial interrogation by a law enforcement officer, State's Attorney, juvenile officer, or other public official or employee prior to the officer, State's Attorney, public official, or employee reading Miranda rights in its entirety to the minor. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure. Provides that an oral, written, or sign language statement of a minor who at the time of the commission of the offense was under 18 years of age, made as a result of a custodial interrogation conducted at a police station or other place of detention shall be presumed to be inadmissible as evidence in a criminal proceeding or a juvenile court proceeding for an act that if committed by an adult would be a misdemeanor sex offense or a felony offense unless (1) an electronic recording is made of the custodial interrogation; and (2) the recording is substantially accurate and not intentionally altered. Amends the Counties Code. Provides that a case involving a minor who was under 15 years of age at the time of the commission of the offense who is required to have representation throughout the entire custodial interrogation that occurs in a county with a full-time public defender office, a public defender, without fee or appointment, may represent and have access to a minor during a custodial interrogation. Provides that a case involving a minor who was under 15 years of age at the time of the commission of the offense who is required to have representation throughout the entire custodial interrogation that occurs in a county without a full-time public defender, the law enforcement agency conducting the custodial interrogation shall ensure that the minor is able to consult with an attorney who is under contract with the county to provide public defender services. Provides that representation by the public defender shall terminate at the first court appearance if the court determines that the minor is not indigent.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the language of the introduced bill with the following changes. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Restores language providing that a minor under 13 years of age at the time of the commission of various criminal offenses must be represented by counsel throughout the entire custodial interrogation. Provides that in a proceeding under the Act that a minor who was at least 13 years of age but not older than 17 years of age at the time of the commission of an act that if committed by an adult would be a violation of various homicide offenses of the Criminal Code of 2012 (rather than a minor who was under 18 at the time of the commission of any offense) must be represented by counsel throughout the entire custodial interrogation of the minor. Provides that an oral, written, or sign language statement of a minor made without counsel present throughout the entire custodial interrogation of the minor in violation of the Act shall be inadmissible as evidence against the minor in any juvenile court proceeding or criminal proceeding. Makes a conforming change in the Criminal Code of 2012. Amends the Counties Code. Provides that in a homicide case involving a minor at least 13 years of age but not older than 17 years of age at the time of the commission of the offense, that occurs in a county with a full-time public defender office, a public defender, without fee or appointment, may represent and have access to a minor during a custodial interrogation. Provides that in a homicide case involving a minor at least 13 years of age but not older than and 17 years of age, that occurs in a county that does not have a full-time public defender, the law enforcement agency conducting the custodial interrogation shall ensure that the minor is able to consult with an attorney who is under contract with the county to provide public defender services. Provides that representation by the public defender shall terminate at the first court appearance if the court determines that the minor is not indigent.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 705 ILCS 405/5-170 -
- 705 ILCS 405/5-401.5 -
- 725 ILCS 5/103-2.1 -
- 55 ILCS 5/3-4006 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-4006