+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2016
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Connelly
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 8, 2016
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2016
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: In provisions concerning the Technology Management Revolving Fund, provides that on and after July 1, 2016, or after sufficient moneys have been received in the Communications Revolving Fund to pay all Fiscal Year 2016 obligations payable from the Fund, whichever is later (rather than the provisions beginning July 1, 2016), all fees and other moneys received by the Department of Central Management Services in payment for communications services rendered pursuant to the Department of Central Management Services Law shall be paid into the Technology Management Revolving Fund. In provisions concerning the Communications Revolving Fund, provides that on July 1, 2016, or after sufficient moneys have been received in the Communications Revolving Fund to pay all Fiscal Year 2016 obligations payable from the Fund, whichever is later, (rather than on July 1, 2016, or as soon thereafter as practical), the State Comptroller shall direct and the State Treasurer shall transfer the remaining balance from the Communications Revolving Fund. Removes provisions immediately dissolving the Communications Revolving Fund. Removes the repeal of the Communications Revolving Fund as of the effective date of the amendatory Act and provides that the Communications Revolving Fund is repealed on December 31, 2016. Effective July 1, 2016.
+ − Statutes Amended (16)
- 20 ILCS 405/405-20 - was 20 ILCS 405/35.7
- 20 ILCS 405/405-250 - was 20 ILCS 405/35.7a
- 20 ILCS 405/405-410 -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.55 - from Ch. 127, par. 141.55
- 30 ILCS 105/6p-1 - from Ch. 127, par. 142p1
- 30 ILCS 105/6p-2 - from Ch. 127, par. 142p2
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-34 -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.16a - from Ch. 127, par. 144.16a
- 30 ILCS 105/5.12 rep. -
- 215 ILCS 5/408 - from Ch. 73, par. 1020
- 215 ILCS 5/408.2 - from Ch. 73, par. 1020.2
- 215 ILCS 5/1202 - from Ch. 73, par. 1065.902
- 215 ILCS 5/1206 - from Ch. 73, par. 1065.906
- 820 ILCS 305/17 - from Ch. 48, par. 138.17
- 820 ILCS 310/17 - from Ch. 48, par. 172.52
- 30 ILCS 105/5.12 -