+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On August 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b)
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Postponed - Insurance
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Insurance
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Insurance
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Insurance
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Insurance
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013
- Second Reading
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013
- Do Pass Insurance; 009-002-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Insurance
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon