+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On August 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2004
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 011-000-000
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Health & Human Services
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
+ − Statute Amended
- 210 ILCS 135/2 - from Ch. 91 1/2, par. 1702
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor