+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
- Second Reading
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
- Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Statute Amended
- 420 ILCS 5/1 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 4301
+ − Vote
March 15, 2017: SB0235 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor