+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (76)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0685
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 1, 2012
- Sent to the Governor
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Appropriations I; 007-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Appropriations I; 007-004-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Appropriations I; 007-004-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Appropriations I; 007-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 033-025-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 033-025-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 033-025-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Senate Concurs 033-025-000
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Jim Sacia
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-053-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- Motion to Reconsider Vote - Lost 054-064-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Appropriations I
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Appropriations I
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Appropriations I
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3, 4
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Appropriations I
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3, 4 - May 31, 2012
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 034-023-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 31, 2011
- Do Pass Appropriations I; 007-005-000
- Assigned to Appropriations I
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Juvenile Justice for its FY13 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2012.
House Floor Amendment No. 2
Amends various Public Acts by changing and adding FY12 appropriations. Makes FY13 appropriations to various agencies. Effective July 1, 2012, except certain provisions are effective immediately.
House Floor Amendment No. 3
Amends Public Act 97-57 by adding an appropriation to the Executive Ethics Commission for the purpose of the Chief Procurement Officer of General Services procuring the services of a Medicaid eligibility consult to assist in the procurement of a third party Medicaid eligibility administration.
House Floor Amendment No. 3
Amends Public Act 97-57 by adding an appropriation to the Executive Ethics Commission for the purpose of the Chief Procurement Officer of General Services procuring the services of a Medicaid eligibility consult to assist in the procurement of a third party Medicaid eligibility administration.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes appropriations and reappropriations to various agencies. Effective July 1, 2011.